WV HB4514 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 236, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 236, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting the use of leashed dogs to track mortally wounded deer or bear
Title
Permitting the use of leashed dogs to track mortally wounded deer or bear
Sponsors
Del. Martin Atkinson [R] | Del. William Anderson [R] | Del. Scott Cadle [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] |
Del. Tim Tomblin [D] | Del. Eric Porterfield [R] | Del. John Paul Hott [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 629) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 717) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 504) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 253) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 717) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 504) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 253) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 236, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 629) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 717) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 504) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-02-21 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2020-02-21 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-20 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 253) |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-23 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-23 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB550 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2 | 22a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2 | 5j | New Code | See Bill Text |