WV HB4647 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
This bill modifies the definition of "express advocacy" to make it consistent with recent U.S. Supreme Court holdings. The bill also increases the number of persons who must receive a broadcast or nonbroadcast communication naming a clearly identified candidate before it can be considered as an electioneering communication. Finally, consistent with recent U.S. Supreme Court precedent, the bill repeals the ban on corporate independent expenditures.
Title
Relating to the regulation and control of elections
Sponsors
Del. Bonnie Brown [D] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Del. Michael Ferro [D] | Del. John Frazier [D] |
Del. Timothy Manchin [D] | Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Clif Moore [D] | Del. Danny Wells [D] |
Del. William Wooton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 76, Acts, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal | |
2010-04-01 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/31/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-31 | To Governor 3/31/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/31/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | Effective ninety days from passage | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 412) | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-13 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) | |
2010-03-13 | Title amendment adopted | |
2010-03-13 | Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent | |
2010-03-13 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 37) | |
2010-03-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-13 | Amended on 3rd reading (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | On 3rd reading with right to amend | |
2010-03-12 | Right to amend on 3rd reading | |
2010-03-12 | Unanimous consent | |
2010-03-12 | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent | |
2010-03-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-12 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-11 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-11 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-11 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-11 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2010-03-02 | To Judiciary | |
2010-03-02 | To Judiciary | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Passed House (Roll No. 132) | |
2010-03-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-01 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-26 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-25 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-24 | By substitute, do pass | |
2010-02-22 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-02-22 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-22 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-22 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB693 (Same As) 2010-02-22 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 8 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 9 | 14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4647&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |