WV HB4766 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require signage for road closures 30 days prior to the closure if the closure will last longer than 30 days and the detour is longer than one mile.
Title
Require Division of Highways to place signage up 30 days prior to road closure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 56) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-01-30 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-01-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 56) |
2024-01-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-01-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-16 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2024-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-16 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure |
2024-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |