WV HB5297 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove pubertal modulation and hormonal therapy from prohibited practices.
Title
Relating to prohibiting pubertal modulation and hormonal therapy when provided to assist in a gender transition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 373) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 373) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2024-02-28 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-28 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2024-02-28 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading with amendments pending and right to amend, Special Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-29 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-29 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 14 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |