WV SB233 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exclude from protection under the Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance Act oral communications uttered in a child care center where there are notices posted informing persons that their oral communications are being intercepted; and defining “child care center”.
Title
Excluding from protection oral communications uttered in child care center under Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 309) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 277) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 277) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 |
2017-04-07 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-06 | Senate | To Governor 4/6/17 |
2017-04-01 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 309) |
2017-04-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 277) |
2017-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2017-03-29 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-20 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2228 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - To House Judiciary
HB2505 (Similar To) 2017-02-16 - To House Judiciary
HB2505 (Similar To) 2017-02-16 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1D | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |