WV SB240 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 54, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 54, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the crime of distribution of nude and sexually explicit images when the person depicted has an expectation of privacy.
Title
Creating crime of nonconsensual distribution of sexual images
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 539) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 438) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 404) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 23) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 438) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 404) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 23) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 54, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 539) |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 438) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 404) |
2017-04-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-02-24 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 23) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 8 | 28a | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 8G | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 8G | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 8G | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |