WV SB336 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-18 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-18 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to grant the Chief of the Division of Wildlife Resources the power to bring actions to recover possession or value of wild animals.
Title
Authorizing Division of Wildlife Resources recover possession or restitution value of certain animals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-18 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 141, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-01 | To Governor 4/1/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-20 | House Message received | |
2010-03-20 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-20 | Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 443) | |
2010-03-20 | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-20 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-20 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-20 | Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 2) | |
2010-03-20 | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) | |
2010-03-20 | Vetoed by Governor 3/16/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-16 | Vetoed by Governor 3/16/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Vetoed by Governor 3/16/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-17 | To Governor 3/17/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-17 | To Governor 3/17/10 | |
2010-03-17 | To Governor 3/17/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-10 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-10 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 1) | |
2010-03-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-09 | Passed House (Roll No. 215) | |
2010-03-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-09 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-08 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-05 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2010-03-04 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-03-01 | To House Natural Resources | |
2010-03-01 | To Natural Resources then Finance | |
2010-03-01 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-26 | Ordered to House | |
2010-02-26 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 2) | |
2010-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-26 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-02-25 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-25 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-24 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-23 | Committee substitute reported | |
2010-01-22 | To Natural Resources | |
2010-01-22 | To Natural Resources | |
2010-01-22 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-22 | To Natural Resources | |
2010-01-22 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2 | 5h | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=336&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |