WV SB337 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require all of an established $11 million Racetrack Video Lottery Fund to be transferred into the existing West Virginia Racing Commission Special Account - Unredeemed Pari-Mutuel Tickets account to be used to pay certain current and unpaid debt payments. The bill also provides that when those debt obligations have been fully met all monies deposited in the Video Lottery Fund will be used for the Workers' Compensation debt service until that debt is retired. The bill removes a provision concerning the Thoroughbred Development Fund. The bill eliminates a $200,000 annual payment for providing health and disability benefits to jockeys and their dependents and also eliminates an obsolete provision concerning a special trust fund. The bill further provides that the Racing Commission may use current funds to pay previously incurred obligations. Additionally, the bill requires certain obligations be paid on a monthly basis and that certain receipts from all thoroughbred racetracks be divided on a pro rata basis between those racetracks. The bill modifies a current treasury account to include funds for greyhound adoption, spaying and neutering.
Title
Requiring Racetrack Video Lottery Fund be used for certain payments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 98, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/23/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-23 | To Governor 3/23/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/23/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 6) | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-11 | Passed House (Roll No. 266) | |
2010-03-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-11 | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-11 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Amendment pending | |
2010-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-10 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-09 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | Do pass | |
2010-03-03 | To House Finance | |
2010-03-03 | To Finance | |
2010-03-03 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-02 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-02 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) | |
2010-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-01 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-26 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-26 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-26 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-02-26 | Committee substitute reported | |
2010-02-10 | To Finance | |
2010-02-10 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2010-01-22 | To Judiciary | |
2010-01-22 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-01-22 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-22 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-01-22 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4519 (Similar To) 2010-02-16 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 23 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 23 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 23 | 13b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22 | 18a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22A | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=337&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |