WV SB345 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 116, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 116, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to parking on state-owned or leased property
Title
Relating to parking on state-owned or leased property
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 448) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 512) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 73) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 512) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 73) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 116, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2016 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-28 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 448) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 512) |
2016-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2016-03-04 | House | To House Finance |
2016-03-04 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-02-10 | House | To House Government Organization |
2016-02-10 | House | To Government Organization then Finance |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 73) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-01-21 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-21 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 10 | 3a | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 4 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |