WV SB38 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is adopt the Service Members Civil Relief Act into West Virginia law.
Title
Creating WV Servicemembers Civil Relief Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 166, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/24/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-24 | Approved by Governor 3/24/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/24/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/23/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-23 | To Governor 3/23/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/23/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 3) | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Passed House (Roll No. 254) | |
2010-03-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-11 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-10 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-09 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-02-18 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-02-18 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-02-16 | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security | |
2010-02-16 | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Judiciary | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-15 | Ordered to House | |
2010-02-15 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2010-02-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-15 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-02-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-12 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-11 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-11 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-10 | Reported do pass | |
2010-02-01 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | To Military | |
2010-01-13 | To Military then Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-13 | To Military then Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=38&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |