WY HB0061 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; modifying elements of the crime of failure to extinguish or contain a fire as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Failure to extinguish or contain fire.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Rep. Thomas Lubnau [R] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Gerald Geis [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 7 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H10 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H10 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H10 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H10 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Failed CoW; Indef Postponed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed CoW |
2014-02-20 | Amendment Failed | |
2014-02-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-20 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-13 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 |
2014-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-01-27 | Bill Number Assigned |