WY HB0061 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to environmental quality; authorizing the governor to begin negotiations with the nuclear regulatory commission to seek an agreement for the state to assume regulation of source material recovered from any mineral resources processed primarily for purposes other than obtaining the source material content; authorizing the governor to negotiate and enter into a final agreement with the nuclear regulatory commission; providing definitions; providing for the department of environmental quality to administer the agreement; providing rulemaking authority; requiring the department of environmental quality to adopt fees as specified; making conforming amendments; providing an appropriation; authorizing positions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Source material associated with mining-agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - Concur:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Assigned Chapter Number 46 | |
2023-02-21 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0022 | |
2023-02-16 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0022 |
2023-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0022 |
2023-02-15 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0022 | |
2023-02-14 | House | Concur:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-07 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-02 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-18 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 |
2023-01-17 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-16 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-13 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-13 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-12 | House | H09 - Minerals:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-12 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-27 | Bill Number Assigned |