WY HB0088 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Uniform Consumer Credit Code; authorizing extended payment plans to repay post-dated check obligations; providing for rescission of post-dated check and similar arrangements; providing for notification relating to payday check cashing laws; renumbering existing provision; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Post-dated checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H Passed CoW (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H Passed CoW (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H01 (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H01 (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H Passed CoW (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H Passed CoW (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H01 (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H01 (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-10 | Governor Signed HEA0047 | |
2014-03-05 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0047 |
2014-03-05 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0047 |
2014-03-04 | Assigned Number HEA0047 | |
2014-03-04 | House | Did Concur |
2014-03-04 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2014-02-28 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed CoW |
2014-02-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-20 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-20 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-13 | House | Rereferred to H07 |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 |
2014-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |