WY HB0101 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; creating an offense of owning a dog which attacks a game and fish law enforcement officer; providing penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Vicious animals-interference with game wardens.
Sponsors
Rep. Kermit Brown [R] | Rep. Richard Cannady [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Rep. Del McOmie [R] | Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-10 - Senate - S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 6 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-02-03 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - H Passed CoW (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - H06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - H Passed CoW (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - H06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed | |
2011-02-03 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-20 | (H06) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-13 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H06 | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |