WY HB0101 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to consumer protection; providing for the protection of customer personal information for broadband internet access service; defining terms; providing for penalties and other enforcement; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Protection and privacy of online customer information.
Sponsors
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Scott Clem [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Rep. Cyrus Western [R] |
Rep. Mike Yin [D] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] | Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2020-02-26 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2020-02-17 | House | H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 57-1-2-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-04 | Bill Number Assigned |