WY HB0164 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - 3rd Reading:H Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 31-31-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - 3rd Reading:H Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 31-31-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the publication of legal notices; requiring legal notices that are required to be published in newspapers to also be published on a statewide website and on the newspaper's website; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Legal notice publication on websites.
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Sherwood [D] | Rep. Daniel Singh [R] | Rep. Clark Stith [R] | Rep. Dave Zwonitzer [R] |
Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] | Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - House - 3rd Reading:H Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 31-31-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 31-31-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-25 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 31-31-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-25 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | House | 3rd Reading:H Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 31-31-0-0-0 |
2023-02-08 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 31-31-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-25 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2023-01-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |