WY SF0100 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to wills and probate; specifying the revocation of probate and nonprobate transfers to a spouse upon divorce or annulment; defining terms; specifying the role and use of governing instruments for revocations; repealing existing provisions concerning the revocation of transfers upon divorce or annulment; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Designation of spouses-revocation upon divorce or annulment.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Crago [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Sen. Edward Cooper [R] |
Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 24-7-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-12-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-7-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-12-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-7-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Assigned Chapter Number 140 | |
2023-03-02 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0070 | |
2023-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0070 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0070 |
2023-02-27 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0070 | |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Concur:Passed 24-7-0-0-0 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 50-12-0-0-0 |
2023-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-16 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2023-01-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-7-0-0-0 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-20 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-01-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-01-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-18 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |