WY SF0107 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of government; generally modifying provisions relating to contracts for public works; modifying contract amounts for which a bond is required; extending temporary provisions relating to procurement requirements for expenditures for capital construction projects; modifying penalties and enforcement provisions; modifying and specifying preference requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public works contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - H Adopted SF0107JC01 (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - S Adopted SF0107JC01 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 2 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 49 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - S Adopted SF0107JC01 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 2 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 49 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2012-03-21 | Governor Signed SEA0064 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0064 | |
2012-03-08 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0064 | |
2012-03-08 | Assigned Number SEA0064 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Adopted SF0107JC01 | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Adopted SF0107JC01 | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Did Not Concur | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-05 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-02 | (H02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H02 | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-27 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-22 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S02 | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-15 | Bill Number Assigned |