AK HB195 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/25/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/25/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to insurer actions based on credit history and insurance scores at insurance policy renewal; and providing for insurer consideration of consumer requests for exceptions of credit history or insurance scores.
Title
Insurer's Use Of Credit History/scores
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 7 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 as amended (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 7 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 as amended (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/25/18 |
2018-03-28 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 3/27 CHAPTER 3 SLA 18 |
2018-03-27 | House | 4:36 PM 3/26/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-03-14 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | VERSION: HB 195 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-03-01 | Senate | PASSED Y13 N4 E3 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2018-03-01 | Senate | AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N11 E2 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N12 E2 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS 1 & 2 UC |
2018-03-01 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 195 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/1 CALENDAR |
2018-02-28 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-02-28 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-02-26 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-02-26 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP 1NR |
2017-05-11 | Senate | FIN |
2017-05-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-05-10 | House | VERSION: HB 195 |
2017-05-10 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-05-10 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2017-05-10 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | House | AM NO 1 AS AM FAILED Y18 N21 E1 |
2017-05-10 | House | AM 1 TO AM 1 ADOPTED Y20 N19 E1 |
2017-05-10 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2017-05-10 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2017-05-10 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 195 |
2017-05-08 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION 5/8 - ON 5/10 CALENDAR |
2017-05-05 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR |
2017-05-05 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-05-05 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2017-04-19 | House | NR: STUTES, JOSEPHSON |
2017-04-19 | House | DNP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, WOOL |
2017-04-19 | House | DP: BIRCH, KITO |
2017-04-19 | House | L&C RPT 2DP 2DNP 2NR |
2017-03-24 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2017-03-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2017-03-24 | House | L&C |
2017-03-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |