AK HB196 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the power project fund and to the bulk fuel revolving loan fund; establishing a bulk fuel loan account and making the bulk fuel loan account and the bulk fuel bridge loan account separate accounts in the bulk fuel revolving loan fund; providing for technical assistance to rural borrowers under the bulk fuel bridge loan program; relating to the administration and investment of the bulk fuel revolving loan fund by the division in the Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development responsible for community and regional affairs; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Bulk Fuel Loans/power Project Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2012-06-01 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/28 CHAPTER 46 SLA 12 | |
2012-05-24 | 1:22 PM 5/24/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-05-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: CSHB 196(FIN) | |
2012-04-15 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED Y19 N- A1 | |
2012-04-15 | FRENCH | |
2012-04-15 | PASKVAN, DAVIS, MCGUIRE, STEDMAN, ELLIS, THOMAS, MEYER, WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS, | |
2012-04-15 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, OLSON, KOOKESH, WAGONER, DYSON, MENARD, EGAN, | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 196(FIN) | |
2012-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2012 | |
2012-04-14 | FN6: (H.FIN/CED) | |
2012-04-14 | FN5: (H.FIN/CED) | |
2012-04-14 | FN4: (H.FIN/CED) | |
2012-04-14 | NR: OLSON | |
2012-04-14 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN | |
2012-04-14 | FIN RPT 4DP 1NR | |
2012-04-14 | FIN | |
2012-04-14 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-04-13 | VERSION: CSHB 196(FIN) | |
2012-04-13 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-04-13 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-13 | PASSED Y36 A3 V1 | |
2012-04-13 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 196(FIN) | |
2012-04-13 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-13 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-13 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-13 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG | |
2012-03-21 | FN6: (H.FIN/CED) | |
2012-03-21 | FN5: (H.FIN/CED) | |
2012-03-21 | FN4: (H.FIN/CED) | |
2012-03-21 | STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2012-03-21 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, | |
2012-03-21 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 10DP | |
2011-03-30 | FN3: (CED) | |
2011-03-30 | FN2: (CED) | |
2011-03-30 | FN1: (CED) | |
2011-03-30 | NR: DICK, AUSTERMAN, SADDLER, MUNOZ | |
2011-03-30 | DP: FOSTER, GARDNER | |
2011-03-30 | CRA RPT 2DP 4NR | |
2011-03-16 | CRA, FIN | |
2011-03-16 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Business
Contracts
Energy
Executive Branch
Funds
Loans
Municipalities
Oil & Gas
Public Utilities
Revenue
Sales
State Aid
Unorganized Borough
Utilities
Contracts
Energy
Executive Branch
Funds
Loans
Municipalities
Oil & Gas
Public Utilities
Revenue
Sales
State Aid
Unorganized Borough
Utilities