AK HB265 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-15 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, MYERS, HUGHES, GRAY-JACKSON, MERRICK, BJORKMAN, STEVENS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-15 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, MYERS, HUGHES, GRAY-JACKSON, MERRICK, BJORKMAN, STEVENS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act changing the term 'child pornography' to 'child sexual abuse material.'
Title
Child Sexual Abuse Material
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1/Withdraw (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1/Withdraw (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1/Withdraw (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1/Withdraw (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, MYERS, HUGHES, GRAY-JACKSON, MERRICK, BJORKMAN, STEVENS |
2024-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2024-03-15 | Senate | STA, JUD |
2024-03-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-03-13 | House | VERSION: HB 265 |
2024-03-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2024-03-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER |
2024-03-13 | House | PASSED Y39 N1 |
2024-03-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 265 |
2024-03-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, ALLARD, GRAY |
2024-03-11 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING NEXT CALENDAR |
2024-03-11 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y6 N34 |
2024-03-11 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN Y25 N15 |
2024-03-11 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-03-11 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/2024 |
2024-02-26 | House | FN4: ZERO(DPS) |
2024-02-26 | House | FN3: ZERO(LAW) |
2024-02-26 | House | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2024-02-26 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2024-02-26 | House | AM: GRAY |
2024-02-26 | House | DP: C.JOHNSON, CARPENTER, ALLARD, GROH, SUMNER, VANCE |
2024-02-26 | House | JUD RPT 6DP 1AM |
2024-02-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER |
2024-02-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT |
2024-02-09 | House | FN4: ZERO(DPS) |
2024-02-09 | House | FN3: ZERO(LAW) |
2024-02-09 | House | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2024-02-09 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2024-02-09 | House | DP: C.JOHNSON, CARRICK, CARPENTER, ALLARD, STORY, WRIGHT, SHAW |
2024-02-09 | House | STA RPT 7DP |
2024-01-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2024-01-16 | House | STA, JUD |
2024-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/12/24 |