AK HB56 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making arson in the first degree and arson in the second degree serious felonies for purposes of application of the crime of conspiracy.
Title
Include Arson In Crimes Of Conspiracy
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Gatto [R] | Rep. Max Gruenberg [D] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] |
Rep. Kurt Olson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/12 | |
2012-06-19 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 66 SLA 12 | |
2012-06-12 | 1:01 PM 6/12/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: HB 56 | |
2012-04-15 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED Y18 N- A2 | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 56 | |
2012-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2012 | |
2012-04-14 | FN6: INDETERMINATE(COR) | |
2012-04-14 | FN5: ZERO(DPS) | |
2012-04-14 | FN4: ZERO(LAW) | |
2012-04-14 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN | |
2012-04-14 | FIN RPT 4DP | |
2012-04-04 | FN6: INDETERMINATE(COR) | |
2012-04-04 | FN5: ZERO(DPS) | |
2012-04-04 | FN4: ZERO(LAW) | |
2012-04-04 | NR: COGHILL | |
2012-04-04 | DP: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2012-04-04 | JUD RPT 2DP 1NR | |
2012-03-12 | JUD, FIN | |
2012-03-12 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-03-06 | VERSION: HB 56 | |
2012-03-06 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-03-06 | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, JOHNSON | |
2012-03-06 | PASSED Y27 N4 E9 | |
2012-03-06 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 56 | |
2012-03-06 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-06 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-03-06 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-24 | FN6: INDETERMINATE(COR) | |
2012-02-24 | FN5: ZERO(DPS) | |
2012-02-24 | FN4: ZERO(LAW) | |
2012-02-24 | NR: T.WILSON, NEUMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, COSTELLO, EDGMON, DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2012-02-24 | DP: GARA | |
2012-02-24 | FIN RPT 1DP 8NR | |
2011-02-23 | FN3: INDETERMINATE(COR) | |
2011-02-23 | FN2: ZERO(DPS) | |
2011-02-23 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2011-02-23 | NR: KELLER, PRUITT | |
2011-02-23 | DP: LYNN, GRUENBERG, GATTO | |
2011-02-23 | JUD RPT 3DP 2NR | |
2011-01-18 | JUD, FIN | |
2011-01-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-18 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11 |