AK HCR2 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-15)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-15)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaiming the state as a Purple Heart State to honor the service and sacrifice of our nation's men and women in uniform wounded or killed by the enemy while serving to protect the freedom enjoyed by all Americans.
Title
Purple Heart State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 6/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 4 |
2013-04-05 | House | 9:55 AM 4/5/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-04-04 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | VERSION: HCR 2 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2013-03-21 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2013-03-21 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FRENCH, OLSON |
2013-03-21 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2013-03-21 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-03-21 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL |
2013-03-19 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP |
2013-03-13 | Senate | STEVENS, DUNLEAVY |
2013-03-13 | Senate | BISHOP, GARDNER, EGAN, GIESSEL, FAIRCLOUGH, STEDMAN, MEYER, HOFFMAN, ELLIS, |
2013-03-13 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON, KELLY, COGHILL, MCGUIRE, |
2013-03-13 | Senate | STA |
2013-03-13 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-03-11 | House | VERSION: HCR 2 |
2013-03-11 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-03-11 | House | SADDLER |
2013-03-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, CHENAULT, HERRON, JOSEPHSON, KELLER, THOMPSON, PRUITT, |
2013-03-11 | House | PASSED Y33 E7 |
2013-03-11 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2013-03-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, STOLTZE, JOHNSON, TUCK, DRUMMOND, KERTTULA, MUNOZ |
2013-03-07 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 3/11 CALENDAR |
2013-03-05 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-03-05 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2013 |
2013-03-04 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2013-03-04 | House | DP: SADDLER, GRUENBERG, HIGGINS, HUGHES, REINBOLD, LEDOUX |
2013-03-04 | House | MLV RPT 6DP |
2013-03-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD |
2013-02-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2013-02-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2013-02-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2013-02-04 | House | MLV |
2013-02-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |