AK HCR2 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Urging Governor Bill Walker to join with the Alaska State Legislature to address the presence of adverse childhood experiences and childhood trauma as factors for many societal issues by establishing a statewide policy, supporting evidence-based programs, and funding research for statewide solutions.
Title
Respond To Adverse Childhood Experiences
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO |
2018-04-18 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, BISHOP, GIESSEL, VON IMHOF |
2018-04-17 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, GARDNER |
2018-04-13 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER |
2018-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES |
2018-04-09 | Senate | HSS |
2018-04-09 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-06 | House | VERSION: CSHCR 2(STA) |
2018-04-06 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON |
2018-04-06 | House | PASSED Y28 N8 E4 |
2018-04-06 | House | STA CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-06 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-06 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2018-04-05 | House | HELD TO 4/6 CALENDAR |
2018-04-04 | House | HELD TO 4/5 CALENDAR |
2018-04-02 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 4/2 - ON 4/4 CALENDAR |
2018-03-30 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/30 - ON 4/2 CALENDAR |
2018-03-29 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/29 - ON 3/30 CALENDAR |
2018-03-28 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION 3/28 - ON 3/29 CALENDAR |
2018-03-27 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/27 - ON 3/28 CALENDAR |
2018-03-26 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/26 - ON 3/27 CALENDAR |
2018-03-23 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/23 - ON 3/26 CALENDAR |
2018-03-22 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/22 - ON 3/23 CALENDAR |
2018-03-21 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/21 - ON 3/22 CALENDAR |
2018-03-20 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/20 - ON 3/21 CALENDAR |
2018-03-19 | House | HELD TO 3/20 CALENDAR |
2018-03-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2018 |
2018-02-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2018-02-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT |
2018-02-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SEATON |
2018-02-12 | House | FN2: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-02-12 | House | NR: BIRCH, KNOPP, LEDOUX, JOHNSON |
2018-02-12 | House | DP: TUCK, WOOL, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2018-02-12 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 3DP 4NR |
2017-03-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.HSS) |
2017-03-24 | House | NR: EASTMAN |
2017-03-24 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-03-24 | House | HSS RPT 6DP 1NR |
2017-02-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2017-01-23 | House | HSS, STA |
2017-01-23 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |