AK HCR2 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/9 LEGIS RESOLVE 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/9 LEGIS RESOLVE 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting Alaska Ocean Cluster
Title
Supporting Alaska Ocean Cluster
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/9 LEGIS RESOLVE 15 |
2022-10-05 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-10-05 | House | 12:10 P.M. 6/17/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-04-25 | Senate | VERSION: HCR 2 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-25 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(H.RLS)(SUBMITTED BY RULES) |
2022-04-22 | Senate | DP: REVAK, KIEHL, VON IMHOF, KAWASAKI, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2022-04-22 | Senate | RES RPT 6DP |
2022-02-15 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI |
2022-02-15 | Senate | RES |
2022-02-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-02-11 | House | VERSION: HCR 2 |
2022-02-11 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-02-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TUCK |
2022-02-11 | House | PASSED Y31 N3 E4 A2 |
2022-02-11 | House | FN2: ZERO(H.RLS)(SUBMITTED BY RULES) |
2022-02-11 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-02-11 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/11/2022 |
2022-02-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2021-05-06 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2021-05-06 | House | NR: MCKAY, CRONK, RAUSCHER, GILLHAM, PATKOTAK |
2021-05-06 | House | DP: FIELDS, HANNAN, SCHRAGE |
2021-05-06 | House | RES RPT 3DP 5NR |
2021-05-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2021-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER |
2021-04-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2021-04-14 | House | NR: MCCABE, VANCE |
2021-04-14 | House | DP: STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS, ORTIZ, TARR |
2021-04-14 | House | FSH RPT 4DP 2NR |
2021-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2021-02-18 | House | FSH, RES |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Business
Economic Development
Economy
Energy
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (fish)
Food
Labor
Marine Facilities
Partnerships
Science & Technology
Water
Economic Development
Economy
Energy
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (fish)
Food
Labor
Marine Facilities
Partnerships
Science & Technology
Water