AK HJR12 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-2-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - PERMANENTLY FILED 5/12 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-2-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - PERMANENTLY FILED 5/12 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Endorsing Anwr Leasing; Related Issues
Title
Endorsing Anwr Leasing; Related Issues
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House: Concur (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 5/12 LEGIS RESOLVE 2 |
2021-05-12 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2021-05-12 | House | 9:37 A.M. 5/12/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-04-05 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y32 N2 E4 A2 |
2021-04-05 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP |
2021-04-05 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2021-03-31 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHJR 12(RES) AM S |
2021-03-31 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2021-03-29 | Senate | ENGROSSED |
2021-03-29 | Senate | PASSED Y13 N2 E5 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 12(RES) AM S |
2021-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-03-29 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2021-03-29 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2021-03-29 | Senate | RES SCS ADOPTED UC |
2021-03-29 | Senate | MICCICHE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): REVAK, COSTELLO, HUGHES, REINBOLD, BISHOP, HOLLAND, STEDMAN, |
2021-03-29 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-03-29 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(H.RES) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | NR: KIEHL |
2021-03-26 | Senate | DP: REVAK, MICCICHE, STEVENS |
2021-03-26 | Senate | RES RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2021-03-17 | Senate | RES |
2021-03-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-03-15 | House | VERSION: CSHJR 12(RES) |
2021-03-15 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-03-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2021-03-15 | House | PASSED Y35 N3 E2 |
2021-03-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 12(RES) |
2021-03-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-03-15 | House | RES CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-03-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-03-15 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.RES) |
2021-03-12 | House | NR: FIELDS, HOPKINS |
2021-03-12 | House | DNP: HANNAN |
2021-03-12 | House | DP: MCKAY, CRONK, RAUSCHER, GILLHAM, SCHRAGE, PATKOTAK |
2021-03-12 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 1DNP 2NR |
2021-02-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2021-02-19 | House | STA REFERRAL REMOVED |
2021-02-18 | House | RES, STA |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska Natives
Energy
Fish & Game (game)
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Native Organizations
Oil & Gas
Proclamations
Public Land
Resources
Revenue
Statehood Act
Energy
Fish & Game (game)
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Native Organizations
Oil & Gas
Proclamations
Public Land
Resources
Revenue
Statehood Act