AK SB128 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the crime of harassment.
Title
Electronic Bullying
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 128(JUD)? (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: HCS CSSB 128(JUD) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: HCS CSSB 128(JUD) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14 |
2014-07-17 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/16 CHAPTER 85 SLA 14 |
2014-07-14 | Senate | 11:13 AM 7/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-18 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1 |
2014-04-18 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-17 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 128(JUD) |
2014-04-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER, MILLETT, COSTELLO, TUCK, JOSEPHSON, TARR |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED Y37 N2 A1 |
2014-04-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 128(JUD) |
2014-04-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-17 | House | JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | FN2: ZERO(COR) |
2014-04-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-04-15 | House | NR: LEDOUX, LYNN, KELLER |
2014-04-15 | House | DP: PRUITT, GRUENBERG |
2014-04-15 | House | JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 2DP 3NR |
2014-04-03 | House | JUD |
2014-04-03 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-02 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 128(JUD) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | WIELECHOWSKI, MICCICHE, HUGGINS |
2014-04-02 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, FAIRCLOUGH, MCGUIRE, GARDNER, EGAN, GIESSEL, STEDMAN, |
2014-04-02 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 128(JUD) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-02 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-02 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-02 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS |
2014-03-10 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(COR) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2014-03-10 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, DYSON |
2014-03-10 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2014-01-22 | Senate | JUD |
2014-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |