AK SB147 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to workers' compensation reemployment rights and benefits; establishing a workers' compensation stay-at-work program; relating to the workers' compensation benefits guaranty fund; relating to the presumption of compensability for workers' compensation claims related to post-traumatic stress disorder; relating to the Alaska senior benefits payment program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Workers' Comp.; Extnd Sr Benefits Payment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to CSSB 147(L&C) Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-12 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2024-07-12 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/11 CHAPTER 12 SLA 24 |
2024-07-03 | Senate | 3:10 P.M. 7/3/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-12 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2024-05-15 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-05-15 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2024-05-15 | Senate | CLAMAN |
2024-05-15 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, TOBIN, GIESSEL, DUNBAR, BISHOP, STEDMAN, |
2024-05-15 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP |
2024-05-15 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 147(L&C) AM H |
2024-05-15 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2024-05-15 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GALVIN, JOSEPHSON, CARRICK, WRIGHT |
2024-05-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-05-15 | House | PASSED Y39 N1 |
2024-05-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 147(L&C) AM H |
2024-05-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2024-05-15 | House | AM NO 5 FAILED Y20 N20 |
2024-05-15 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2024-05-15 | House | AM NO 4 ADOPTED Y36 N4 |
2024-05-15 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2024-05-15 | House | AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y28 N12 |
2024-05-15 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2024-05-15 | House | AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y39 N1 |
2024-05-23 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 27 |
2024-05-15 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2024-05-15 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y27 N13 |
2024-05-15 | House | L&C HCS ADOPTED UC |
2024-05-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-05-14 | House | HELD TO 5/15 CALENDAR |
2024-05-14 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/14/2024 |
2024-05-11 | House | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2024-05-11 | House | NR: SUMNER |
2024-05-11 | House | DP: FIELDS, CARRICK, PRAX, SADDLER, WRIGHT, RUFFRIDGE |
2024-05-11 | House | L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 6DP 1NR |
2024-03-11 | House | L&C |
2024-03-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-03-06 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 147(L&C) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-03-06 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 147(L&C) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/6 CAL |
2024-03-04 | Senate | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2024-03-04 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-03-04 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | NR: DUNBAR, MERRICK |
2024-02-23 | Senate | DP: BJORKMAN, GRAY-JACKSON |
2024-02-23 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 2DP 2NR TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE |
2024-02-19 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL REMOVED |
2024-01-29 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BJORKMAN, GRAY-JACKSON |
2023-05-11 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2023-05-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Claims
Death
Disabilities
Employment
Funds
Health & Social Services
Hearings
Labor
Mental Health
Physicians
Public Employees
Regulations
Rights
Senior Citizens
State Aid
Sunset
Workers Compensation
Claims
Death
Disabilities
Employment
Funds
Health & Social Services
Hearings
Labor
Mental Health
Physicians
Public Employees
Regulations
Rights
Senior Citizens
State Aid
Sunset
Workers Compensation