AK SB206 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to motor vehicle registration and fees; relating to licensing of school bus drivers; relating to notice of an accident involving a motor vehicle; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Vehicle Regis/licensing/accident Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 206(STA)? Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/14 |
2014-06-24 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/19 CHAPTER 45 SLA 14 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | 10:30 AM 6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-15 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) - SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE |
2014-04-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-18 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1 |
2014-04-18 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-17 | House | VERSION: CSSB 206(STA) AM H |
2014-04-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, LEDOUX, LYNN, JOSEPHSON, PRUITT |
2014-04-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2014-04-17 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-17 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 206(STA) |
2014-04-16 | House | HAWKER, MUNOZ |
2014-04-16 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, MILLETT, OLSON, FEIGE, COSTELLO, ISAACSON, HOLMES, |
2014-04-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR |
2014-04-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-16 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-15 | House | DP: ISAACSON, LYNN, GATTIS, HUGHES, KELLER |
2014-04-15 | House | STA RPT 5DP |
2014-04-10 | House | STA |
2014-04-10 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-09 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 206(STA) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-09 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, GIESSEL, WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS, FAIRCLOUGH, MEYER, EGAN |
2014-04-09 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 206(STA) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-09 | Senate | STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-09 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-09 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/09/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI |
2014-03-26 | Senate | DP: DYSON, COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2014-03-26 | Senate | STA RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2014-02-26 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE |
2014-02-26 | Senate | STA |
2014-02-26 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alcohol
Child Abuse
Crimes
Internet
Law Enforcement
Licensing
Motor Vehicles
Pornography
Public Safety
Schools
Child Abuse
Crimes
Internet
Law Enforcement
Licensing
Motor Vehicles
Pornography
Public Safety
Schools