AK SB61 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/9/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/9/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to claims against protection and indemnity insurance policies of vessel owners.
Title
Fishermen's Fund:vessel Owner Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/9/19 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 9/10 CHAPTER 25 SLA 19 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | 4:47 P.M. 9/6/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-08 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2019-05-08 | House | VERSION: SB 61 |
2019-05-08 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2019-05-08 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2019-05-08 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 61 |
2019-05-08 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-05-08 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-08 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2019 |
2019-04-26 | House | FN1: (LWF) |
2019-04-26 | House | FOSTER |
2019-04-26 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, MERRICK, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, WILSON, |
2019-04-26 | House | FIN RPT 9DP |
2019-04-22 | House | FIN |
2019-04-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: SB 61 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2019-04-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 61 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR |
2019-04-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | FN1: (LWF) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | NR: SHOWER, OLSON, WILSON |
2019-04-01 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN |
2019-04-01 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 3NR |
2019-03-06 | Senate | FN1: (LWF) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | DP: REINBOLD, COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, BISHOP, BIRCH |
2019-03-06 | Senate | L&C RPT 5DP |
2019-02-18 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2019-02-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |