AL HB104 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pardons, posthumous pardons persons convicted of a Class A or B felony, to further provide for pardons after death, to delete requirement of granting based on racial discrimination, Sec. 15-22-113 am'd.
Title
Pardons, posthumous pardons persons convicted of a Class A or B felony, to further provide for pardons after death, to delete requirement of granting based on racial discrimination, Sec. 15-22-113 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1025 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 98 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - HBIR: Gaston motion to Adopt Roll Call 97 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 98 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - HBIR: Gaston motion to Adopt Roll Call 97 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-382. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1025 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 98 |
2022-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |