AL HB144 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental appropriations from Education Trust Fund to specified agencies for fiscal year ending September 30, 2024.
Title
Supplemental appropriations from Education Trust Fund to specified agencies for fiscal year ending September 30, 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - In Conference Committee (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 926 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt - Roll Call 925 3A8LZZE-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 595 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 594 7JSLVV2-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 593 DFI8HNN-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 592 7JXTVE2-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Garrett motion to Table - Roll Call 591 3JRSEZZ-1 (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 590 NA67888-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 926 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt - Roll Call 925 3A8LZZE-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 595 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 594 7JSLVV2-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 593 DFI8HNN-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 592 7JXTVE2-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Garrett motion to Table - Roll Call 591 3JRSEZZ-1 (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 590 NA67888-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-17 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2024-05-09 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-09 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar 9L5FMBM-1 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | In Conference Committee |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reed Accede to House Request for Conference |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 926 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 925 3A8LZZE-1 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Orr 2nd Substitute Offered 3A8LZZE-1 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote CMD9WJW-1 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Substitute Offered CMD9WJW-1 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Substitute CMD9WJW-1 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-16 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 595 |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 594 7JSLVV2-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Bracy 1st Amendment Offered 7JSLVV2-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 593 DFI8HNN-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Stadthagen 1st Amendment Offered DFI8HNN-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 592 7JXTVE2-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | McCampbell 1st Amendment Offered 7JXTVE2-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Garrett motion to Table - Adopted Roll Call 591 3JRSEZZ-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Hall 1st Amendment Offered 3JRSEZZ-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 590 NA67888-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Ways and Means Education 1st Substitute Offered NA67888-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | House | Ways and Means Education 1st Substitute NA67888-1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |