AL HB151 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marine Police Division, transfer from ALEA to Conservation and Natural Resources Dept., Sec. 41-27-6 am'd.
Title
Marine Police Division, transfer from ALEA to Conservation and Natural Resources Dept., Sec. 41-27-6 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Sells [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security first Amendment Offered |
2017-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-03-02 | House | Rereferred from SG to PS&HS |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |