AL HB154 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental appropriations, Home Builders Property Acquisition Fund to Home Builders Licensure Board; Alabama State Board of Midwifery Fund to the Alabama State Board of Midwifery; and Alabama Behavior Analyst Licensing Board Fund to the Alabama Behavior Analyst Licensing Board, supp. approp. for fiscal year 2019
Title
Supplemental appropriations, Home Builders Property Acquisition Fund to Home Builders Licensure Board; Alabama State Board of Midwifery Fund to the Alabama State Board of Midwifery; and Alabama Behavior Analyst Licensing Board Fund to the Alabama Behavior Analyst Licensing Board, supp. approp. for fiscal year 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Clouse motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Clouse motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-395. |
2019-05-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | House | Concurred in Conference Report |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1357 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-29 | House | Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1140 |
2019-05-29 | House | Conference Report |
2019-05-28 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1175 P&PO appoints Marsh, Albritton and Singleton |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Conference Committee Requested |
2019-05-21 | House | Clouse motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 845 House appoints Hall, South and Clouse |
2019-05-21 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 964 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 963 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Albritton Amendment Offered |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Albritton motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2019-04-09 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-09 | House | Forte, Clarke and Jones (S) intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 155 |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 154 |
2019-04-09 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |