AL HB198 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2016, Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to the Department of Education and Alabama Community College System
Title
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2016, Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to the Department of Education and Alabama Community College System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-04-27 | House | Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 1 substitute |
2017-04-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |