AL HB204 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Birmingham Host Committee 2025 World Police and Fire Games tax exemptions
Title
Birmingham Host Committee 2025 World Police and Fire Games tax exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Instrument Change Tabled WUB6E59-1 (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Instrument Change Tabled WUB6E59-1 (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 290 |
2024-03-21 | House | Lovvorn motion to Table - Adopted Roll Call 289 WUB6E59-1 |
2024-03-21 | House | Robbins 1st Amendment Offered WUB6E59-1 |
2024-03-21 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-06 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |