AL HB219 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 7:30 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 7:30 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement officers, assaults of while performing lawful duty, classified as assault in the second degree, to include off-duty officers employed by a private entity, Sec. 13A-6-21 am'd.; Act 2010-565, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Law enforcement officers, assaults of while performing lawful duty, classified as assault in the second degree, to include off-duty officers employed by a private entity, Sec. 13A-6-21 am'd.; Act 2010-565, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Alan Boothe [R] | Rep. Harry Bridges [R] | Rep. Lynn Greer [R] |
Rep. Stephen Hurst [R] | Rep. Richard Laird [D] | Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - House - Ball motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 7:30 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-550 on 06/09/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2011-06-02 | Ball motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1117 | |
2011-06-02 | Concurrence Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 985 | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 984 | |
2011-06-02 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-14 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 307 | |
2011-04-14 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 306 | |
2011-04-14 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-03-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |