AL HB219 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Delivered to Governor at 3:16 p.m. on March 16, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Delivered to Governor at 3:16 p.m. on March 16, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coal severance tax (1971 tax), extended to 2031, distribution of tax revenue beginning 2021-2022, remainder after certain distribution earmarked for Surface Mining Commission, Secs. 40-13-6, 40-13-8 am'd.
Title
Coal severance tax (1971 tax), extended to 2031, distribution of tax revenue beginning 2021-2022, remainder after certain distribution earmarked for Surface Mining Commission, Secs. 40-13-6, 40-13-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle South [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 540 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Reed motion to Adopt Roll Call 539 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 20 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 19 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - HBIR: South motion to Adopt Roll Call 18 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Reed motion to Adopt Roll Call 539 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 20 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 19 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - HBIR: South motion to Adopt Roll Call 18 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:16 p.m. on March 16, 2021. |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-120. |
2021-03-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 540 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2021-02-09 | House | Engrossed |
2021-02-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 20 |
2021-02-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 19 |
2021-02-09 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered |
2021-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 13 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 13 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |