AL HB244 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Psychology Professional Wellness Committee, established within Psychology Examiners board to provide intervention services to impaired licensed professionals, duties, immunity provided, Sec. 34-26-4 added
Title
Psychology Professional Wellness Committee, established within Psychology Examiners board to provide intervention services to impaired licensed professionals, duties, immunity provided, Sec. 34-26-4 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Stutts motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Stutts motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 872 |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 871 |
2018-03-15 | House | Health Amendment Offered |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-01-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |