AL HB302 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, Mandatory Liability Insurance Law, definitions updated, eliminate four-month suspension of registration for second and subsequent violations, allow voluntary surrender of vehicle registration and license plate under certain conditions, Secs. 32-7A-2, 32-7A-5, 32-7A-8, 32-7A-11, 32-7A-12 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, Mandatory Liability Insurance Law, definitions updated, eliminate four-month suspension of registration for second and subsequent violations, allow voluntary surrender of vehicle registration and license plate under certain conditions, Secs. 32-7A-2, 32-7A-5, 32-7A-8, 32-7A-11, 32-7A-12 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Rowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-446. |
2019-05-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1327 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |
2019-05-22 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 872 |
2019-05-22 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 871 |
2019-05-22 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |