AL HB363 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and offenses; murder and manslaughter further provided for
Title
Crimes and offenses; murder and manslaughter further provided for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 520 (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 519 K4QXAU5-1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 518 LX96AAA-1 (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 519 K4QXAU5-1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 518 LX96AAA-1 (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Pending Senate Judiciary |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-11 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 520 |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 519 K4QXAU5-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Faulkner 1st Amendment Offered K4QXAU5-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 518 LX96AAA-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Judiciary Engrossed Substitute Offered LX96AAA-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Judiciary LX96AAA-1 |
2024-04-03 | House | Judiciary 1st Amendment 5SCPM66-1 |
2024-03-21 | House | Pending House Judiciary |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |