AL HB365 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal officials, requires participation in training
Title
Municipal officials, requires participation in training
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Currently Indefinitely Postponed |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-17 | House | County and Municipal Government 1st Substitute WY1X959-1 |
2024-03-21 | House | Pending House County and Municipal Government |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on County and Municipal Government |