AL HB376 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Illegal immigration; procedures for arrest, detention, transportation of illegal aliens provided for; reporting requirements established; penalties established
Title
Illegal immigration; procedures for arrest, detention, transportation of illegal aliens provided for; reporting requirements established; penalties established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Currently Indefinitely Postponed |
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-24 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security 1st Substitute XTWHZ7Z-1 |
2024-03-21 | House | Pending House Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |