AL HB385 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Drivers' licenses, exempting homeless children and youth from certain fees associated with drivers' licenses, Law Enforcement Agency rulemaking authority further provided, Secs. 32-6-4, 32-6-6.1, 32-6-13, 32-6-15, 32-6-21 am'd.
Title
Drivers' licenses, exempting homeless children and youth from certain fees associated with drivers' licenses, Law Enforcement Agency rulemaking authority further provided, Secs. 32-6-4, 32-6-6.1, 32-6-13, 32-6-15, 32-6-21 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle South [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - South motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 953 (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 975 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 974 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - SBIR: Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 973 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 528 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 527 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: South motion to Adopt Roll Call 526 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 975 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 974 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - SBIR: Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 973 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 528 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 527 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: South motion to Adopt Roll Call 526 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-300 on 04/12/2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | House | South motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 953 |
2022-04-06 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 975 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hatcher motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 974 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hatcher Amendment Offered |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 528 |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 527 |
2022-03-09 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 6 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 6 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 6 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 6 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 6 | 6.1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |