AL HB397 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 6:30 p.m. on May 3, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 6:30 p.m. on May 3, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dothan, ad valorem tax, increased, referendum, distrib. to city board of education and Houston-Love Memorial Library Board
Title
Dothan, ad valorem tax, increased, referendum, distrib. to city board of education and Houston-Love Memorial Library Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 46) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 46) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Delivered to Governor at 6:30 p.m. on May 3, 2011. | |
2011-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2011-246. | |
2011-05-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-03 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 482 | |
2011-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 183 | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |