AL HB411 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Forwarded to Governor on April 15, 2021 at 1:25 p.m. on April 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Forwarded to Governor on April 15, 2021 at 1:25 p.m. on April 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement officers database, created and maintained by Peace Officers' Standards and Training Commission, reporting by law enforcement agencies re employment, confidentiality, background checks for employment, criminal and civil penalties, immunity provisions
Title
Law enforcement officers database, created and maintained by Peace Officers' Standards and Training Commission, reporting by law enforcement agencies re employment, confidentiality, background checks for employment, criminal and civil penalties, immunity provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - McCampbell motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 848 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 944 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 943 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 942 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 505 (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - McCampbell motion to Adopt Roll Call 504 (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 502 (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 501 (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 70) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 500 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - HBIR: McCampbell motion to Adopt Roll Call 499 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 944 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 943 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 942 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 505 (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - McCampbell motion to Adopt Roll Call 504 (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 502 (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 501 (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 70) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 500 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - HBIR: McCampbell motion to Adopt Roll Call 499 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 15, 2021 at 1:25 p.m. on April 15, 2021. |
2021-04-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-268. |
2021-04-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-15 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-15 | House | McCampbell motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 848 |
2021-04-15 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 944 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 943 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2021-03-30 | House | Engrossed |
2021-03-30 | House | Motion to Again Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 505 |
2021-03-30 | House | McCampbell motion to reconsider bill adopted Roll Call 504 |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Engrossed |
2021-03-18 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2021-03-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 502 |
2021-03-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 501 |
2021-03-18 | House | McCampbell Amendment Offered |
2021-03-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 500 |
2021-03-18 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security first Substitute Offered |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2021-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
SB158 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Judiciary first Substitute Offered