AL HB431 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 5:27 p.m. on May 9, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 5:27 p.m. on May 9, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Etowah Co., alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales authorized under certain conditions within a municipality or unincorporated area, referendums
Title
Etowah Co., alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales authorized under certain conditions within a municipality or unincorporated area, referendums
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:27 p.m. on May 9, 2017. |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-305. |
2017-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 941 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-04-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 554 |
2017-04-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |