AL HB441 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities, outdoor advertising regulated by Department of Transportation, enforcement in corporate limits by municipalities authorized, Sec. 23-1-278 am'd.
Title
Municipalities, outdoor advertising regulated by Department of Transportation, enforcement in corporate limits by municipalities authorized, Sec. 23-1-278 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Kerry Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Rich motion to Table (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Rich motion to Table (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Governmental Affairs first Amendment Offered |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Governmental Affairs |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2015-05-12 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 704 |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 703 |
2015-05-12 | House | Rich Amendment Offered |
2015-05-12 | House | Rich motion to Table adopted Roll Call 702 |
2015-05-12 | House | County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered |
2015-05-12 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |