AL HB564 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:09 p.m. on April 29, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:09 p.m. on April 29, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., human sewage, commission authorized to levy tax
Title
Jefferson Co., human sewage, commission authorized to levy tax
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle South [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1189 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1188 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 745 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: South motion to Adopt Roll Call 744 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1188 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 745 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: South motion to Adopt Roll Call 744 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 1:09 p.m. on April 29, 2021. |
2021-04-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-368. |
2021-04-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1189 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 745 |
2021-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |