AL HB585 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 5:49 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 5:49 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Brewton, Development Authority, provisions limiting operations to central business district and industrial park removed, Secs. 45-27A-31, 45-27A-31.01, 45-27A-31.08 am'd.
Title
Brewton, Development Authority, provisions limiting operations to central business district and industrial park removed, Secs. 45-27A-31, 45-27A-31.01, 45-27A-31.08 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 63 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 63 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:49 p.m. on May 19, 2017. |
2017-05-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-455. |
2017-05-19 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-19 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1307 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-05-17 | House | Jones intended to vote "Yea" |
2017-05-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 923 |
2017-05-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |